(PS) Chiu v. Lu Mien Church et al
Plaintiff: Taifusin Chiu
Defendant: Lu Mien Church, President of the United States, Donald Trump and Iu Mien Church
Case Number: 2:2023cv02215
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/30/2023 DIRECTING the Clerk to change the spelling of the first defendant, GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Taifusin Chiu. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE re: 900 Graham's Number by Taifusin Chiu. (Lopez, K)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE re: the President showdown by Taifusin Chiu (Lopez, K)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE re: Medal of Honor versus Purple Heart by Taifusin Chiu. (Lopez, K)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE re: Medal of Honor Award by Taifusin Chiu. (Lopez, K)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE re: Mien family by Taifusin Chiu. (Lopez, K)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE re: Cullinan diamond bond by Taifusin Chiu. (Lopez, K)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Taifusin Chiu. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lu Mien Church, President of the United States, Donald Trump by Taifusin Chiu. (Clemente Licea, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Chiu v. Lu Mien Church et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taifusin Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Mien Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iu Mien Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?