(PC) Johnson v. Unknown FBI Agents
Plaintiff: Kevin B. Johnson
Defendant: Unknown FBI Agents
Case Number: 2:2023cv02622
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 12/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
November 21, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kevin B. Johnson. (Benson, A.)
November 14, 2023 [DISREGARD] APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Murphy, J) Modified on 11/21/2023 (Benson, A.).
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re SUMMONS. (Murphy, J)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Kevin B. Johnson. (Murphy, J)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kevin B. Johnson. (Murphy, J)
November 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown FBI Agents by Kevin B. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Johnson v. Unknown FBI Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown FBI Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?