(PC) Dunham v. Mohyuddin et al
Plaintiff: Randall Dunham
Defendant: Aliasghar Mohyuddin, Salisbury and K. Petersen
Case Number: 2:2023cv02757
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 01/16/2024. Consent or Decline due by 2/20/2024. (Spichka, K.)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aliasghar Mohyuddin, K. Petersen, Salisbury* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Randall Dunham #AZ-0338* *California Health Care Facility* *P.O. Box 213040* *Stockton, CA 95213*. (Spichka, K.)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 01/12/2024 FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *Aliasghar Mohyuddin*, *Salisbury*,*K. Petersen*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this to be Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Waiver) (Spichka, K.)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate served on Randall Dunham. (Spichka, K.)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/13/2023 DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Lopez, K)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Randall Dunham. (Lopez, K)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Account of Randall Dunham signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/5/2023. Plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's ifp on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Randall Dunham. (Yin, K)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/28/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Murphy, J)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Randall Dunham. (Murphy, J)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Randall Dunham. (Murphy, J)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Randall Dunham. (Murphy, J)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Aliasghar Mohyuddin, K. Petersen, - Salisbury by Randall Dunham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Dunham v. Mohyuddin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliasghar Mohyuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?