(PC) Woods v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Earl Woods
Defendant: Gena Jones and Ruiz
Case Number: 2:2023cv03053
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Ruiz by Aaron Earl Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, J)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Clemente Licea, O)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 01/16/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
January 16, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Aaron Earl Woods. (Spichka, K.)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Trust Account of Aaron Earl Woods signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/5/2024. Plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's ifp on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
January 8, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Aaron Earl Woods. (Yin, K)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/29/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 2/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Nair, C)
January 3, 2024 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Aaron Earl Woods. (Nair, C)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Aaron Earl Woods. (Nair, C)
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Gena Jones, Ruiz by Aaron Earl Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nair, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Woods v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Earl Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?