Garcia v. City of Manteca et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Garcia
Defendant: City of Manteca and Kody Odom
Case Number: 2:2024cv00033
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley James Swingle on behalf of City of Manteca, Kody Odom. Attorney Swingle, Bradley James added. (Swingle, Bradley)
February 15, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Manteca, Kody Odom.(Scott, Graham)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 6/11/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-00033-DAD-KJN. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 30, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by City of Manteca, Kody Odom. (Scott, Graham)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Scott, Graham)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Clemente Licea, O)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Manteca, Kody Odom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Geralyn L Skapik* *Skapik Law Group* *5861 Pine Ave, Suite A-1* *Chino Hills, CA 91709*. (Clemente Licea, O)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Tomas Garcia (Skapik, Geralyn)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tomas Garcia. Attorney Skapik, Geralyn L added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11272255) (Skapik, Geralyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. City of Manteca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Garcia
Represented By: Geralyn L Skapik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manteca
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kody Odom
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?