Drum Lodge, LLC v. Martel Construction, Inc.
Petitioner: Drum Lodge, LLC
Respondent: Martel Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00219
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY by Martel Construction, Inc. re #12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Geddes, J)
February 27, 2024 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Drum Lodge, LLC to #12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark McGlynn, #2 Declaration of David Myre, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16)(Myre, David)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2024 GRANTING Petitioner an extension of time to respond to #12 Motion to Dismiss by 2/27/2024. (Woodson, A)
February 21, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Drum Lodge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myre, David)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/09/2024 GRANTING #11 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney J Devlan Geddes, PHV for Martel Construction, Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Nair, C)
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Respondent Martel Construction, Inc.. (Wilson, Deborah)
February 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Martel Construction, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of J. Devlan Geddes, #3 Declaration of Anthony Martel, #4 Declaration of Keeley Davisworth, #5 Declaration of Rachel Buchner, #6 Proposed Order) (Wilson, Deborah) Modified on 2/9/2024 (Clemente Licea, O).
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Martel Construction, Inc. for attorney J. Devlan Geddes to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11336966) (Wilson, Deborah)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Deborah Jean Wilson on behalf of Martel Construction, Inc.. Attorney Wilson, Deborah Jean added. (Wilson, Deborah)
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Lifrak on behalf of Drum Lodge, LLC. Attorney Lifrak, Michael added. (Lifrak, Michael)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to VACATE Arbitration Award by Drum Lodge, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak, #3 Declaration of David E. Myre, #4 Proposed Order) (Myre, David) Modified on 1/26/2024 (Clemente Licea, O).
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Myre, III on behalf of Drum Lodge, LLC. (Myre, David)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Petitioner Drum Lodge, LLC. (Myre, David)
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Drum Lodge, LLC served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (Myre, David)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Drum Lodge, LLC served on 1/24/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (Myre, David)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Clemente Licea, O)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Martel Construction, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Myre, III* *Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP* *51 Madison Ave, Ste 22nd Floor* *New York, NY 10010*. (Clemente Licea, O)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION to VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against Martel Construction, Inc. by Drum Lodge, LLC. Attorney Myre, David added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11294521) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myre, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drum Lodge, LLC v. Martel Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Drum Lodge, LLC
Represented By: David Myre, III
Represented By: Michael Lifrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martel Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Jean Wilson
Represented By: J Devlan Geddes, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?