(HC) Iseli v. Lynch
Petitioner: Branden Willie Iseli
Respondent: Jeff Lynch
Case Number: 2:2024cv00821
Filed: March 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Branden Willie Iseli. (Kyono, V)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Screening by Branden Willie Iseli. (Murphy, J) [Response sent - The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken on your case.] Modified on 4/3/2024 (Yin, K).
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Branden Willie Iseli. (Kyono, V)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kyono, V)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jeff Lynch by Branden Willie Iseli.(Kyono, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Iseli v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Branden Willie Iseli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?