(HC) Iseli v. Lynch
Petitioner: Branden Willie Iseli
Respondent: Jeff Lynch
Case Number: 2:2024cv00837
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OBJECTIONS by Petitioner Branden Willie Iseli to #6 Order. (Murphy, J)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of Petition served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Yin, K)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/25/2024. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/25/2024 GRANTING petitioner's #5 motion to proceed ifp and DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition within 60 days. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Branden Willie Iseli. (Yin, K)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Branden Willie Iseli. (Kyono, V)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kyono, V)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/22/2024 DIRECTING Petitioner to File a Motion for IFP or pay the Filing Fee within 30 days from the date of this Order. (Murphy, J)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP Application served on Branden Willie Iseli. (Murphy, J)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Murphy, J)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Branden Willie Iseli. (Murphy, J)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jeff Lynch by Branden Willie Iseli. (Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Iseli v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Branden Willie Iseli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?