(PC) Kern v. Soloman
Plaintiff: James Kern and James Curtis Kern
Defendant: Tamera Lynn Soloman
Case Number: 2:2024cv01040
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/03/2024 GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING Plaintiff to pay the Filing Fee or file an IFP Application within 30 days of the date of this order. (Murphy, J)
June 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on James Curtis Kern. (Murphy, J)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for EXTENSION OF DEADLINES and Notice of Change of Address to PBSP (5905 Lake Earl Dr., Crescent City, CA 95531) mailing P.O. Box 7500, Crescent City, CA 95532 by James Curtis Kern. (Kyono, V) Modified on 5/29/2024 (Yin, K).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/8/2024 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. (Huang, H)
May 8, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and IFP Application served on James Curtis Kern. (Huang, H)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR Copy of #1 Complaint by James Curtis Kern. (Kyono, V) [Response sent w/ conformed copy and copies procedure: #1 Complaint is 7 pages.] Modified on 5/6/2024 (Spichka, K.).
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior District Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-1040 WBS DMC. (Kyono, V)
April 29, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on James Curtis Kern. (Kyono, V)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kyono, V)
April 9, 2024 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Murphy, J)
April 9, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Kern. (Murphy, J)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Tamera Lynn Soloman by James Kern.(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Kern v. Soloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Curtis Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamera Lynn Soloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?