(PC) Doss v. Mule Creek State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Robert Doss and Robert L. Doss
Defendant: Mule Creek State Prison, San Joaquin General Hospital, Hia Nyo and Sabreana Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2024cv01092
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Trust Account of Robert L. Doss signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 6/4/2024.The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's ifp on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 6/3/2024 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed ifp and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached Notice of Amendment with an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. (Yin, K)
June 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 , #7 Orders served on Robert L. Doss. (Yin, K)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE re March 2023 hospital visit by Robert L. Doss. (Nair, C) Modified on 5/10/2024 (Yin, K).
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
April 11, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Nair, C)
April 11, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert Doss. (Nair, C)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Doss. (Nair, C)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Robert Doss. (Nair, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Doss v. Mule Creek State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mule Creek State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hia Nyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabreana Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?