(HC) Wilhelm v. Mule Creek State Prison
Petitioner: Steve Wilhelm
Respondent: Mule Creek State Prison
Case Number: 2:2024cv01226
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP form served on Steve Wilhelm. (Kyono, V)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/4/2024 DIRECTING Petitioner to file a Motion for IFP or pay the $5 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Kyono, V)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steve Wilhelm. (Kyono, V)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kyono, V)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Mule Creek State Prison by Steve Wilhelm.(Kyono, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Wilhelm v. Mule Creek State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mule Creek State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?