(HC) Scoggins v. Schultz
Petitioner: Gerald Scoggins
Respondent: Schultz
Case Number: 2:2024cv01398
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 11 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of Petition served on Tami Krenzin #9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Spichka, K.)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/06/2024. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Spichka, K.)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/06/2024 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Spichka, K.)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/06/2024 GRANTING the #4 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Spichka, K.)
June 6, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order and #9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Gerald Scoggins. (Spichka, K.)
June 4, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-1398 DAD DMC (HC). (Kyono, V)
June 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Gerald Scoggins. (Kyono, V)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to STAY by Gerald Scoggins. (Kyono, V)
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kyono, V)
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gerald Scoggins. (Kyono, V)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/21/2024 DIRECTING Petitioner to submit a complete Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Kyono, V)
May 22, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP form served on Gerald Scoggins. (Kyono, V)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Clemente Licea, O)
May 20, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gerald Scoggins. (Clemente Licea, O)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Schultz by Gerald Scoggins. (Clemente Licea, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Scoggins v. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?