USA v. Vollrath et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Northern California Collection Service Inc., American Express National Bank, California Franchise Tax Board, Michael Vollrath and Butte County
Case Number: 2:2024cv01458
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Lien Priority by United States of America. (Uhalde, Matthew)
July 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Roger Stuart Wilson on behalf of Butte County. Attorney Wilson, Roger Stuart added. (Wilson, Roger)
June 26, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Butte County served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (Uhalde, Matthew)
June 26, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Northern California Collection Service Inc. served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (Uhalde, Matthew)
June 26, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Express National Bank served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Uhalde, Matthew)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Franchise Tax Board served on 6/21/2024, answer due 7/12/2024. (Uhalde, Matthew)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Vollrath served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Uhalde, Matthew)
May 23, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Nair, C)
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Express National Bank, Butte County, California Franchise Tax Board, Northern California Collection Service Inc., Michael Vollrath* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew Uhalde, GOVT* *DOJ-Tax* *PO Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Nair, C)
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Uhalde, Matthew added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uhalde, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Vollrath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vollrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County
Represented By: Roger Stuart Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Uhalde, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?