(PC) Smiley v. Schultz et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jerome Smiley
Defendant: Bernadino and Jason Schultz
Case Number: 2:2024cv01626
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXHIBITS re: Mental Health Documentation by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Affidavit). (Nair, C). Modified on 7/22/2024 (Nair, C).
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Nair, C)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Licea Chavez, V)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXHIBITS re CDCR letter by Jeremy Jerome Smiley (Licea Chavez, V)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Bernadino, Jason Schultz by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Murphy, J)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-01626 KJM EFB. (Murphy, J)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Murphy, J)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER from Family of Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Lopez, K) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/21/2024) (Lopez, K).
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jeremy Jerome Smiley (Kyono, V)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Jeremy Jerome Smiley, CDCR No. BV-3009, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Huang, H)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jeremy Jerome Smiley with CDCR Number. (Huang, H)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Kyono, V)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *6/7/2024*. Consent or Decline due by 7/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kyono, V)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Kyono, V)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Bernadino, Jason Schultz by Jeremy Jerome Smiley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kyono, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Smiley v. Schultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jerome Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?