(PS) Love v. Tri-Counties Bank
Plaintiff: Mary Love
Defendant: Tri-Counties Bank
Case Number: 2:2024cv01823
Filed: June 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Mary Love. (Kyono, V)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 08/08/2024 GRANTING IN PART #9 Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING Plaintiff to file an Opposition by 08/22/2024. No further extensions of time will be granted to Plaintiff. The Court will decide Defendant's motion on the record and written briefing, pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). (Murphy, J)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Mary Love. (Murphy, J)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Mary Love. (Kyono, V)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 8/6/2024: Presently pending before the court is Defendant Tri-Counties Bank's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ), which was filed on July 18, 2024 and which is set for hearing on September 3, 2024. Under E.D. Cal. Local Rule 230(c), Plaintiff Mary Love's opposition or statement of non-opposition was due within 14 days of the filing of Defendant's motion, or August 1, 2024. This deadline has passed without any opposition or statement of non-opposition filing by Plaintiff. Local Rule 230(c) states "No party will be entitled to be heard in opposition to a motion at oral arguments if opposition to the motion has not been timely filed by that party." Accordingly, the September 3, 2024 hearing is VACATED and the motion will be submitted for decision on the record and written briefing pursuant to Local Rule 230(c) and (g). If the court subsequently determines that supplemental briefing or oral argument is necessary, the parties will be notified. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Mary Love. (Waldrop, A)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #5 Motion to Dismiss, : Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (CSK) before Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. (McWhorter, Robert)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Defendant shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim for available law and motion dates and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 9/5/2024 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Minute Order served on Mary Love. (Krueger, M)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Tri-Counties Bank. Attorney McWhorter, Robert Scott added. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Robert S. McWhorter, #4 Proof of Service) (McWhorter, Robert)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Woodson, A)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tri-Counties Bank* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary Love* *13312 Thistle Loop* *Penn Valley, CA 95946-9146*. (Woodson, A)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/18/2024: Plaintiff Mary Love filed a Complaint, seeking, among other things, a temporary restraining order ("TRO") and a preliminary injunction against Defendant Tri-Counties Bank. (ECF No. #1 .) Except in the most extraordinary circumstances, Local Rule 231 requires a party seeking a TRO to give actual notice to the affected party or counsel and file with the Court the following documents: (1) a complaint; (2) a motion for a TRO; (3) a brief on all relevant legal issues presented in the motion; (4) an affidavit in support of the existence of an irreparable injury; (5) an affidavit detailing the notice or efforts to effect notice to the affected party or counsel or showing good cause why notice should not be given; (6) a proposed TRO with a provision for a bond; and (7) a proposed order with blanks for fixing the time and date for hearing a motion for a preliminary injunction, the date for the filing of responsive papers, the amount of the bond, if any, and the date and hour of issuance (if requesting a TRO ex parte, the proposed order must also notify the affected party of the right to apply to the Court for modification or dissolution on two days' notice or such shorter notice as the Court may allow). Because Plaintiff has failed to satisfy one or more of these requirements, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for a TRO. Any renewed motion for a TRO shall comply with all applicable laws and rules. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons and #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Mary Love. (Woodson, A)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 2 Minute Order served on Mary Love. (Krueger, M)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number 200007850 in the amount of $405 for Filing Fee; paid by Mary Love. (Woodson, A)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tri-Counties Bank by Mary Love with MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. [OPENED pursuant to Minute Order filed in 2:22-cv-1761 TLN CKD] (Donati, J) Modified on 6/28/2024 (Donati, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Love v. Tri-Counties Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Counties Bank
Represented By: Robert Scott McWhorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?