Leahy v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Leahy
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc. a Tennessee Corporation Doing business as Clayton Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv01855
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2024 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Linda Leahy to #15 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Linda Leahy, #2 Declaration Elan Dunaev) (Dunaev, Elan)
August 23, 2024 Filing 16 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by CMH Homes, Inc. to #15 Motion to Compel. (Weber, Matthew)
July 30, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED #8 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by CMH Homes, Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 9/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Julie Campbell, #3 Declaration of Lisa Caruso, #4 Proof of Service) (Weber, Matthew) Modified on 7/30/2024 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 30, 2024 Filing 14 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
July 29, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/29/2024: Considering this case's reassignment to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (ECF No. #8 ) set for 8/21/2024 before the undersigned is hereby VACATED without prejudice, to be re-noticed before the District Judge. SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L)
July 29, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-1855 KJM CKD. (Licea Chavez, V)
July 26, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Dunaev, Elan)
July 17, 2024 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Weber, Matthew)
July 17, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/17/2024: This case was removed on 7/3/2024 and assigned solely to the undersigned pursuant to Appendix A of the court's Local Rules. Under the Initial Scheduling Order, all parties were to inform the Clerk of Court of their decision whether to Consent or Decline magistrate judge jurisdiction for all purposes in this case by filing their Consent/Decline form (ECF No. 4-1) within 90 days of the date the action was filed. On 7/16/2024, defendant filed a #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration, set for hearing on a date the undersigned is not available. Before rescheduling the motion, the court must determine whether all parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction for all purposes. There is no obligation to consent, and no judge will be notified of a party's decision unless all parties have consented. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1). However, for proper case administration, each party must inform the Clerk of Court whether or not it consents to magistrate judge jurisdiction for all purposes. Therefore, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, all parties SHALL file their Consent/Decline form. SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L)
July 17, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Elan J. Dunaev. (Kennison, L)
July 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by CMH Homes, Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 8/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Julie Campbell, #3 Declaration of Lisa Caruso, #4 Proposed Order) (Weber, Matthew) Modified on 7/18/2024 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 10, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Weber, Matthew)
July 10, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by CMH Homes, Inc. re #4 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Weber, Matthew)
July 10, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by CMH Homes, Inc. re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #1 Notice of Removal. (Weber, Matthew)
July 3, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CMH HOMES, INC.. (Weber, Matthew)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by CMH HOMES, INC. (Weber, Matthew)
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Yolo County Superior Court, case number CV2024-1099 by CMH Homes, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11615820) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Weber, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leahy v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc. a Tennessee Corporation Doing business as Clayton Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Leahy
Represented By: Elan J. Dunaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?