(PC) Martinez v. Rios
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Martinez
Defendant: C. Rios
Case Number: 2:2024cv02474
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sean C Riordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 10/31/2024 RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with court orders. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R.)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations served on Ronald F. Martinez. (Becknal, R.)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-2474 DAD SCR. (Licea Chavez, V)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ronald F. Martinez. (Licea Chavez, V)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Licea Chavez, V)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 09/16/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $405 within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Ronald F. Martinez. (Spichka, K.)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California and Closing Case in Fresno Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 09/11/2024. CASE TRANSFERRED to Sacramento Division. New Case Number 2:24-cv-2474-SCR. Old Case Number 1:24-cv-01073-HBK. (Maldonado, C)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against C. Rios by Ronald F. Martinez. (Maldonado, C)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronald F. Martinez. (Maldonado, C)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Ronald F. Martinez. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martinez v. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?