Towers et al v. Post Properties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Towers and Roger Towers
Defendant: Lanaya Pfister, Lanaya Post, Post Properties LLC and Peter H. Post
Case Number: 2:2024cv02965
Filed: October 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dena M Coggins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/20/2024: In light of Plaintiffs' #11 Response, the 8 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 19, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Roger Towers, Catherine Towers re {8} Minute Order. (Harris, Justin) Modified on 12/22/2024 (Woodson, A).
December 17, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/17/2024: The court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #9 First Amended Complaint. Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) provides that "[a] party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course... 21 days after serving it, or... 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f)..." Accordingly, Defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED as MOOT and the 1/17/2025 Motion Hearing is VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 13, 2024 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Roger Towers, Catherine Towers. (Harris, Justin) Modified on 12/16/2024 (Woodson, A).
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/13/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 230(c), because Defendants' pending #7 Motion to Dismiss was filed on 11/22/24, Plaintiffs' deadline to file either an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the pending Motion was 12/6/2024. Plaintiffs have not filed an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition as required. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, no later than 12/19/2024, why Plaintiffs have failed to comply with Local Rule 230(c). (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Lanaya Pfister, Peter H. Post, Post Properties LLC. Attorney Jones, Drexwell M. added. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8 (DC) before District Judge Dena M. Coggins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration ) (Jones, Drexwell) Modified on 11/25/2024 (Salmeron, A).
November 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Post Properties LLC served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Harris, Justin)
November 11, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Peter H. Post served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Harris, Justin)
November 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lanaya Pfister served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Harris, Justin)
October 29, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Joint Status Report Filing Deadline: 2/10/2025 (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
October 29, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lanaya Pfister, Peter H. Post, Post Properties LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Justin Dennis Harris* *Harris Law Firm, PC* *7110 N. Fresno St., Suite 400* *Fresno, CA 93720*. (Benson, A.)
October 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Roger Towers, Catherine Towers. Attorney Harris, Justin Dennis added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11838144) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harris, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towers et al v. Post Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Towers
Represented By: Justin Dennis Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Towers
Represented By: Justin Dennis Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanaya Pfister
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanaya Post
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Properties LLC
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Post
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?