(SS) Boucher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Boucher
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2024cv02970
Filed: October 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/18/2024, Nunc Pro Tunc 11/15/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-2970 CKD (SS). (Becknal, R.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/18/2025. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Becknal, R.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Francesco Paulo Benavides* *Law Offices of Francesco Benavides* *1990 N. California Blvd., 8th Floor* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Becknal, R.)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/2024 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING E-Service. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Becknal, R.)
November 7, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
October 30, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jennifer Boucher. (Benavides, Francesco)
October 30, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jennifer Boucher. Attorney Benavides, Francesco Paulo added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Benavides, Francesco)
October 30, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lopez, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Boucher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Boucher
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?