(SS) Nunez v. Commissioner Social Security
Plaintiff: Octavio Nunez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2024cv03166
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/8/2025 EXTENDING deadline for defendant to respond to complaint to 2/28/2025. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
January 8, 2025 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Social Security Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
November 22, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/18/2025. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Mendez Licea, O)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Kevin D. Heitke* *Summit Disability Law LLC* *5215 N. Ironwood Rd., Suite 202* *Milwaukee, WI 53217*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Mendez Licea, O)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Octavio Nunez. Attorney Heitke, Kevin D. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11871139) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Heitke, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Nunez v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Nunez
Represented By: Kevin D. Heitke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?