(PC) Martin v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Amaya Martin
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Davis, California Institution for Women and State of California
Case Number: 2:2024cv03380
Filed: December 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/28/2025 DENYING Defendants' #3 Request for Clarification as moot and DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action. Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson assigned for all further proceedings. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand be granted, this case be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California in and for the County of Sacramento, and the Clerk be directed to send a certified copy of this order to the Superior Court of California in and for the County of Sacramento and to close the case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. New Case Number: 2:24-cv-3380 TLN JDP (PC). (Deputy Clerk KS)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, State of California to #7 Motion to Remand. Attorney Glantz, Zachary added. (Glantz, Zachary)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Amaya Martin. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Laura)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Davis, State of California by Amaya Martin. (Wagner, Nicholas)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Amaya Martin. (Wagner, Nicholas)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Zachary Glantz on behalf of California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation. Attorney Glantz, Zachary added. (Glantz, Zachary)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Clarification Regarding Screening of Complaint and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Mark, Arthur)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2025. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Becknal, R.)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV018187 by B. Freriks . (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11905040) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mark, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martin v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Arthur B. Mark, III
Represented By: Zachary Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institution for Women
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Arthur B. Mark, III
Represented By: Zachary Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaya Martin
Represented By: Nicholas J.P. Wagner
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?