J.M. v. Red Roof Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: J. M.
Defendant: PDK Hospitality, LLC and Red Roof Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv03384
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Red Roof Franchising, LLC on 1/22/2025, Answer due 3/24/2025 (Barrick, Penny)
January 27, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-00672-KJM by Red Roof Franchising, LLC. Attorney Villalobos, Amanda added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Villalobos, Amanda)
December 11, 2024 Filing 9 PRO HACE VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/11/24 GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Penny L. Barrick, PHV for J. M.. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is DIRECTED to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Salmeron, A)
December 11, 2024 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/11/24 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Jeremy Hoshor-Johnson, PHV for J. M.. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is DIRECTED to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Salmeron, A)
December 10, 2024 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by J. M. for attorney Penny L. Barrick to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11916801) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Chrisp, Jesse)
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by J. M. for attorney Jeremy Hoshor-Johnson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11916789) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Chrisp, Jesse)
December 5, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2024: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (ECF No. #2 .) Before the Court rules on the motion, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to serve the motion on Defendants with their Complaint. Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days from appearing in this case to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the motion. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 4, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *PDK Hospitality, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jesse B. Chrisp* *Law Offices of J. Chrisp* *9667 Highway 29* *Lower Lake, CA 95457*. (Benson, A.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED UNDER a PSEUDONYM by J. M.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chrisp, Jesse)
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by J.M. Attorney Chrisp, Jesse B. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BCAEDC-11901614) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chrisp, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.M. v. Red Roof Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M.
Represented By: Jesse B. Chrisp
Represented By: Penny L. Barrick, PHV
Represented By: Penny L. Barrick, PHV
Represented By: Jeremy Hoshor-Johnson, PHV
Represented By: Jeremy Hoshor-Johnson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDK Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?