Hipwell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Hipwell
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2024cv03448
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/29/2025 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendants' Response to #1 Complaint to 3/3/2025. (Deputy Clerk OML)
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Defendants' Time To Respond to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lapidus, Christopher)
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to #1 complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lapidus, Christopher) Modified on 12/30/2024 (Zignago, K.).
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elliot Wayne Gale* *Gale, Angelo, Johnson P.C.* *2999 Douglas Blvd., Suite 111* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Benson, A.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cindy Hipwell. Attorney Gale, Elliot Wayne added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11920523) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gale, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hipwell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Conroy Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Conroy Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Hipwell
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?