Stapleton v. United Healthcare Benefits Plan of CA
Plaintiff: Jackie Stapleton
Defendant: United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California
Case Number: 2:2024cv03738
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/19/2025 VACATING 3/19/2025 Motion hearing date and DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 14 days why her failure to respond to the pending motion should not result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 20, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Jackie Stapleton. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 19, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION re #5 Motion to Dismiss by United Healthcare Benefits Plan of California . (Slaught, Kathleen) Modified on 2/20/2025 (OML).
February 12, 2025 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/12/2025. On the court's own motion the #5 Motion to Dismiss currently scheduled for 03/12/2025 is VACATED and RESET for 03/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk JAA)
February 12, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Jackie Stapleton. (Deputy Clerk JAA)
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of ERRATA #1 Notice of Removal by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California. (Slaught, Kathleen) Modified on 1/31/2025 (AJB).
January 30, 2025 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California re #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Slaught, Kathleen)
January 30, 2025 Filing 6 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California in re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Slaught, Kathleen) Modified on 1/31/2025 (AJB).
January 30, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slaught, Kathleen) Modified on 1/31/2025 (AJB).
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California re #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Slaught, Kathleen)
January 3, 2025 Filing 3 JOINT STIPULATION for EXTENTION of TIME to respond to Complaint by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California. (Slaught, Kathleen) Modified on 1/4/2025 (KML).
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lopez, K)
December 27, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Jackie Stapleton. (Lopez, K)
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-SC-2023-0004533 by United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California . (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11944722) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Of Jane Stalinski , #3 Certificate Of Interested Parties And Rule 7.1 Disclosure) (Slaught, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stapleton v. United Healthcare Benefits Plan of CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Benefits Plan Of California
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?