USA v. Wells
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Kirby Wells
Case Number: 2:2024mc00356
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sean C Riordan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 10/28/24 RELATING cases 2:21-cr-164 WBS, 2:24-mc-352 WBS SCR, 2:24-mc-353 WBS SCR, 2:24-mc-354 WBS SCR, 2:24-mc-356 WBS SCR. (Licea Chavez, V)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Opposition, #2 Declaration, #3 Notice of Related Cases) (Tubesing, Robin)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cr-00164-WBS, 2:24-mc-00352-DAD-CSK, 2:24-mc-00353-DAD-CSK, 2:24-mc-0354-DAD-CSK by United States of America. (Tubesing, Robin)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff United States of America to #8 #9 Requests re Hearing by Robert Kirby Wells . (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Tubesing, Robin)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for the Clerk to Arrange a Telephonic Appearance for the #8 Debtor's hearing by Robert Kirby Wells. (Becknal, R.)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for Debtor's Hearing by Robert Kirby Wells. (Becknal, R.)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America re #6 Certificate / Proof of Service,. (Tubesing, Robin)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Debtor, #2 Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #3 Issued Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #4 Clerk's Notice to Debtor_Request for Hearing [form], #5 Acknowlegment of Service and Answer of Garnishee) (Tubesing, Robin)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of SERVICE and ANSWER of GARNISHEE by Farmers Insurance F.C.U.. (Mendez Licea, O)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #3 Issued Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #4 Acknowledgment of Service and Answer [form]) (Tubesing, Robin)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WRIT of Continuing Garnishment ISSUED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Writ of Continuing Garnishment_Clerk's Notice by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice to Debtor_Request for Hearing [form]) (Tubesing, Robin)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Writ of Garnishment. (Salmeron, A)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION for WRIT of GARNISHMENT [Garnishee Farmers Insurance Federal Credit Union] by United States of America. Attorney Tubesing, Robin added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tubesing, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kirby Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robin Tubesing, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?