Mayfeild v. PowerSchool Group, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Torrie Mayfeild
Defendant: PowerSchool Holdings, Inc. and PowerSchool Group LLC
Petitioner: Sheilah Buack-Shelton, Stance Schudy, Megan Joseph, Dale Kidder and Emily Kidder
Case Number: 2:2025cv00203
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dena M Coggins
Referring Judge: Sean C Riordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 03/05/25 GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, PHV for Torrie Mayfeild. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk KML)
March 4, 2025 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Torrie Mayfeild for attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Berry, M. Anderson added. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12075046) (Berry, M.)
February 21, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00517-AC by Megan Joseph, Dale Kidder, Emily Kidder. Attorney Saveri, Joseph R. added. (Saveri, Joseph)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00252-DJC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00259-JDP, 2:25-cv-00256-JDP, 2:25-cv-00271-AC by Sheilah Buack-Shelton, S. S.. (LaComb, Tim)
January 21, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00093-JAM-AC, 2:25-cv-00171-JDP, 2:25-cv-00165-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00206-CKD, 2:25-cv-00204-JAM-JD, 2:25-cv-00208-CKD, 2:25-cv-00209-AC, 2:25-cv-00210-WBS-AC, 2:25-cv-00207-DAD-CSK, 2:25-cv-00211-SCR by Sheilah Buack-Shelton, S. S.. Attorney LaComb, Tim added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LaComb, Tim)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Joint Status Report Filing Deadline: 4/29/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Deputy Clerk OML)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *PowerSchool Group, LLC, PowerSchool Holdings, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brett R. Cohen* *Leeds Brown Law PC* *One Old Country Road, Suite 347* *Carle Place, NY 11514*. (Deputy Clerk OML)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PowerSchool Holdings, Inc., Powerschool Group LLC by Torrie Mayfeild. Attorney Cohen, Brett R. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11975629) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cohen, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfeild v. PowerSchool Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PowerSchool Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PowerSchool Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrie Mayfeild
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheilah Buack-Shelton
Represented By: Timothy Z. LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stance Schudy
Represented By: Timothy Z. LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Megan Joseph
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Kidder
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emily Kidder
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?