(PC) Joseph v. Woodburn
Plaintiff: Deleon Lee Joseph
Defendant: Lindy Woodburn
Case Number: 2:2025cv00238
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/6/2025 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed IFP By a Prisoner. (Deputy Clerk HAH)
March 7, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and IFP Application served on Deleon Lee Joseph. (Deputy Clerk HAH)
February 3, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Deleon Lee Joseph. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/23/2025 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp, with the required certified copy of trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp form. (Deputy Clerk KLY)
January 23, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp form served on Deleon Lee Joseph. (Deputy Clerk KLY)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 2/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Deputy Clerk OML)
January 21, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Deleon Lee Joseph. (Deputy Clerk OML)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Lindy Woodburn by Deleon Lee Joseph. (Deputy Clerk OML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Joseph v. Woodburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deleon Lee Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindy Woodburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?