USA v. Approx. $24,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $24,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2025cv00528
Filed: February 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2025 Filing 8 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date 3/22/2025. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider, #5 Order. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 10, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Arrest of defendant currency and Warrant for Arrest by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/20/25 ORDERING Clerk to issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Warrant issued) (Deputy Clerk AJB)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Khasigian, Kevin)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/18/2025. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
February 14, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Deputy Clerk VLC)
February 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Approximately $24,100.00 in U.S. Currency by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Application for Publication, #2 Proposed Order , #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khasigian, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approx. $24,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $24,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?