USA v. Approx. $34,820.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $34,820.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2025cv00533
Filed: February 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Filing 8 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date 3/22/2025. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Order, #2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS, #3 Order, #1 Complaint,. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 11, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Arrest of Defendant Currency on 3/11/2025, and Warrant for Arrest by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 6, 2025 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Khasigian, Kevin)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/21/2025 ORDERING Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem, #2 Affidavit) (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 2/19/2025. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Deputy Clerk AJB)
February 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $34,820.00 in U.S. Currency by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application for Publication, #3 Proposed Order)(Khasigian, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approx. $34,820.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $34,820.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?