(PC) West v. Withrow et al
Plaintiff: Roy West
Defendant: Patrick Withrow, Samuel Cortez, Taylor Vos, Ma Del Carmen Plosser and Robyn Mendoza
Case Number: 2:2025cv00537
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE re Filing Fees by Roy West. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/21/2025 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge this matter and RECOMMENDING plaintiff's #6 application to proceed ifp be denied, and plaintiff be given 21 days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations to pay the filing fee of $405. Assigned and referred to Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Deputy Clerk KLY)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order And Findings and Recommendations served on Roy West. (Deputy Clerk KLY)
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roy West. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/6/2025 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $405. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed IFP By a Prisoner. (Deputy Clerk HAH)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and IFP Application served on Roy West. (Deputy Clerk HAH)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Deputy Clerk KML)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 3/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Roy West. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against defendants by Roy West. (Deputy Clerk VLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) West v. Withrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma Del Carmen Plosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?