(PC) Bonilla v. Penney
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Penney
Case Number: 2:2025cv00573
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 3 JUDGMENT dated *3/10/2025* pursuant to order signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 3/7/2025. (Deputy Clerk OML)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 3/7/2025 DISMISSING this case. No further documents will be accepted in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk OML)
March 10, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order and #3 Judgment served on Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Deputy Clerk OML)
February 21, 2025 LODGED COMPLAINT filed by Vexatious Litigant - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 LODGED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jeffrey S. Penney by Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Deputy Clerk VLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bonilla v. Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?