(SS) Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marci Hughes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2025cv00660
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Boesch, Victoria L. added. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #4 Payment Documents, #5 Jurisdictional Documents, #6 Non-Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3, #11 Medical Records Part 4, #12 Medical Records Part 5, #13 Medical Records Part 6, #14 Medical Records Part 7, #15 Medical Records Part 8, #16 Medical Records Part 9, #17 Medical Records Part 10, #18 Medical Records Part 11, #19 Medical Records Part 12, #20 Medical Records Part 13, #21 Medical Records Part 14, #22 Medical Records Part 15, #23 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1-1313), #24 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1314-1740), #25 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1741-1968), #26 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1969-2120), #27 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2121-2255), #28 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2256-2397), #29 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2398-2486), #30 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2487-2614), #31 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2615-2888), #32 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 2889-3284), #33 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 3285-3438), #34 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 3439-3637), #35 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 3638-3738), #36 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 3739-4049))(Boesch, Victoria)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/2025, Nunc Pro Tunc 2/27/2025: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:25-cv-00660 AC (SS). (Deputy Clerk OML)
February 27, 2025 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
February 26, 2025 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Ruble, Megan)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/30/2025. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Megan Elizabeth Ruble* *Kelly, Duarte, Urstoeger & Ruble* *P.O. Box 142* *Modesto, CA 95353*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Marci Hughes. Attorney Ruble, Megan Elizabeth added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12058605) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruble, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marci Hughes
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ruble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Victoria L. Boesch
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?