(HC) Martin v. Phillips et al
Defendant: Arinda Phillips and Jim Cooper
Petitioner: Dumitru Martin
Case Number: 2:2025cv00687
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 4/1/2025 DIRECTING the respondent to file an Answer or Motion to Dismiss to the #1 Petition by 5/15/25. If the respondent files an answer, the petitioner has until 6/16/25 to file a reply. If the respondent files a Motion to Dismiss, the petitioner must file an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to the Motion by 6/16/25. (cc USAO) (Deputy Clerk AMW)
March 13, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:23cv2858-AC, 2:25cv663-DJC-AC by Dumitru Martin. (Wiggin, Carolyn)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/12/2025 ORDERING that the Court's #14 Temporary Restraining Order be ADOPTED as an Order for Preliminary Injunction; ORDERING Respondents to transfer Petitioner back into prerelease custody; RESTRAINING and ENJOINING Respondents from removing Petitioner from prerelease custody based on his immigration status; ORDERING that no bond be required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). (Deputy Clerk GJM)
March 10, 2025 Filing 16 JOINT RESPONSE AND STIPULATION by the Parties re #14 Order. (Balazs, John) Modified on 3/11/2025 (KLY).
March 7, 2025 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/07/2025: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(d), District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta WITHDRAWS the automatic reference of this matter to a Magistrate Judge and RETAINS it for all further proceedings. Any future Motions or filings shall be brought before Judge Calabretta unless expressly referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge by the Court. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Deputy Clerk RAA)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/07/25 GRANTING #6 Motion for TRO as follows: Respondents are ORDERED to TRANSFER Mr. Dumitru Martin back into prerelease custody. Respondents are further RESTRAINED and ENJOINED from removing Petitioner from prerelease custody based on his immigration status. This TRO shall expire on 03/21/25, at 5:00 P.M., absent further order of this Court and no bond shall be required. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer and file a joint response by 03/11/25, as to whether any further evidence or briefing need be presented or whether the Court may adopt this order as a preliminary injunction pending a final adjudication on the merits. If either party requests further briefing on whether a preliminary injunction should be entered, the parties shall propose a briefing schedule. (Deputy Clerk AJB)
March 5, 2025 Filing 13 REPLY by Dumitru Martin to #12 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Balazs, John) Modified on 3/7/2025 (AJB).
March 5, 2025 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Jim Cooper, Arinda Phillips to #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Rodriguez, Michelle)
March 4, 2025 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/04/2025: Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. Respondent shall file an Opposition to Petitioner's Motion (ECF No. #6 ) on or before 03/05/2025, at 5:00 P.M. Any Reply from Plaintiff shall be filed by 03/06/2025, at 1:00 P.M. The hearing in this matter set for 03/05/2025, at 4:00 P.M. in Courtroom 7 before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta is VACATED. Should the Court determine it is necessary after having reviewed the briefing, the Court will reset the hearing on a later date. Nothing in this order alters any deadlines or dates set in the related case (2:25-cv-00663). [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Deputy Clerk RAA)
March 4, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for 1-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to RESPOND re #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Jim Cooper, Arinda Phillips. Attorney Rodriguez, Michelle added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Michelle)
March 4, 2025 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/4/2025: In response to Petitioner Dumitru Martin's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #6 ), the Parties are ORDERED to adhere to the following briefing schedule: the Respondents shall file an Opposition to Petitioner's Motion on March 4, 2025; Petitioner may file a Reply by 1:00 p.m. March 5, 2025. In their Opposition, the Respondents may reference the briefing filed in 2:25-cv-00663-DJC-AC. A hearing on the matter shall be held on March 5, 2025, at 4:00 p.m., via videoconference, before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Deputy Clerk GJM)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/4/2025 REASSIGNING 2:25-cv-00687 to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. New Case Number: 2:25-cv-00687-DJC-AC. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
March 3, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00687-TLN, 2:25-cv-00663-DJC by Dumitru Martin. (Balazs, John)
March 3, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Dumitru Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dumitru Martin, #2 Declaration of Counsel re Notice, #3 Declaration of Counsel re Irreparable Injury, #4 Proposed Order for TRO and OSC for Preliminary Injunction, #5 TRO Checklist)(Balazs, John)
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. The new case number is: 2:25-cv-0687-TLN-CSK P. (Deputy Clerk HAH)
February 28, 2025 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Balazs, John)
February 27, 2025 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 4/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Deputy Clerk VLK)
February 27, 2025 PAYMENT for habeas petition filing fee in the amount of $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-12065069. (Balazs, John)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Dumitru Martin. (Balazs, John)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against All Defendants by Dumitru Martin. Attorney Balazs, John Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum , #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Balazs, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Martin v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dumitru Martin
Represented By: John Paul Balazs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arinda Phillips
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Michelle Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cooper
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Michelle Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?