Sharma et al v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Anilech Sharma and Parma Sharma
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P., Preferred Mortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Max Default Services Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv05968
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on February 4, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka.Parties may appear by phone.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/8/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharma et al v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anilech Sharma
Represented By: Stephen Conrad Ruehmann
Represented By: Marc Alan Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parma Sharma
Represented By: Stephen Conrad Ruehmann
Represented By: Marc Alan Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Darren John Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Darren John Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Default Services Corporation
Represented By: Darren John Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?