Show v. Astrue
Plaintiff: James Gary Show
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2010cv04718
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER dismissing case pursuant to parties' stipulation. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 14 Stipulation filed by James Gary Show. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 . Pursuant to stipulation, Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until 4/22/2011 to file motion for summary judgment. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Show v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gary Show
Represented By: Kenneth J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?