Allen v. Bayshore Mall et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Allen
Defendant: Bayshore Mall and General Growth Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02368
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 144 Order, 146 Stipulation filed by Jessica Allen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 8, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 142 Settlement Conference. Dismissal or Statement due by 6/19/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 140 Letter filed by General Growth Properties, Inc. Excusing Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/02/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 86 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Bayshore Mall; 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Jessica Allen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 11, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 71 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Bayshore Mall. Expert Disclosures due by 9/16/2013. Expert Rebuttal due by 10/7/2013. Fact and Expert Discove ry due by 11/14/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2014. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/15/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 - 5/19/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 28 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Bayshore Mall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Allen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayshore Mall
Represented By: Aimee G. Hamoy-Perera
Represented By: Paul Caleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Growth Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Caleo
Represented By: Aimee G. Hamoy-Perera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?