Burton v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Burton
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv04831
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Burton
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?