Estate of Emerald Rose Herriot et al v. County of Mendocino et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cram, James Herriot and Estate of Emerald Rose Herriot
Defendant: Rita Hurley, John Melnicoe, Chuck Dunbar, County of Mendocino, Sue Norcross, Nancy Kozak and Vickie Lynn Soloniuk
Case Number: 1:2013cv05720
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Damages Hearing filed by Jennifer Cram. Hearing reset for 11/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/7/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 34 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Wilson Lee Tubbs (erroneously sued as Joshua Wilson Tubbs) filed by Jennifer Cram. Joshua Wilson Tubbs terminated. Motion re Damages Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/11/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING COURT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF JAMES HERRIOT ON JULY 9, 2014 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/7/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/30/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Emerald Rose Herriot et al v. County of Mendocino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Melnicoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Mendocino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Norcross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Lynn Soloniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cram
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Dennis R. Ingols
Represented By: Brett ONeill Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Herriot
Represented By: Brett ONeill Terry
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Dennis R. Ingols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Emerald Rose Herriot
Represented By: Brett ONeill Terry
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Dennis R. Ingols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?