Apex Directional Drilling, LLC v. SHN Consulting Engineers & Geologists, Inc.

Plaintiff: Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Defendant: SHN Consulting Engineers & Geologists, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv02501
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/4/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
December 7, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY AND RESET CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
September 10, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/10/2017 at 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/10/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/10/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 11, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apex Directional Drilling, LLC v. SHN Consulting Engineers & Geologists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Represented By: Paul W. Conable
Represented By: Michael Clark Willes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHN Consulting Engineers & Geologists, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Derrick Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?