Harris v. Lake County et al

Plaintiff: James La Vell Harris
Defendant: Lake County, Lake County Sheriff's Dept., California Medical Forensic Service, E. Bussard, Alicia Stottsberry and K. C. Grisby
Case Number: 1:2015cv03117
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
January 11, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 33 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 5, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating CMC. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/14/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Lake County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James La Vell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Forensic Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Bussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Stottsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. C. Grisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?