Stein v. United States Department of Commerce

Plaintiff: Alan Stein
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Case Number: 1:2015cv03510
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 37 Stipulation RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by United States Department of Commerce. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 5, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC filed by United States Department of Commerce. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 7, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW TIME TO NEGOTIATE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by United States Department of Commerce. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
April 19, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. The Case Management Conference scheduled for April 20, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
February 10, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 2/19/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 5/27/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 8/9/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 10, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
December 1, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by United States Department of Commerce. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
August 5, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to J Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Stein
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Represented By: Rachel Susanna Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?