Dennis Andrews v. Pfizer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Andrews
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv04884
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim in case 3:15-cv-04884-RS; denying (99) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-md-02691-RS. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASES C 15-04884 RS AND C 15-05251 HSG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/28/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis Andrews v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Andrews
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Meghan E. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Loren H. Brown
Represented By: George J. Gigounas
Represented By: Matthew A. Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?