Pacific Choice Seafood Company et al v. Pritzker et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Choice Seafood Company, Sea Princess, LLC and Pacific Fishing, LLC
Defendant: Penny Pritzker and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 1:2015cv05572
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Motion to Appear by Telephone at October 18, 2016 case management conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 14, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 66 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
September 26, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Stipulation Re Summary Judgment Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 31, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 54 REQUEST TO EXPAND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/31/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 23, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 19, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 2, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 20, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying Defendants 22 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
February 19, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS' 23 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 21, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Having considered the motion to consider whether cases should be related (13-cv-1419 TEH to 15-cv-5572 HSG), the court hereby determines that the two cases are not related Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/21/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 13, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer. Having considered the motion to consider whether cases should be related (15-cv-5572HSG to 10-cv-4790CRB), the Court hereby determines that: the two cases are not related. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/12/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Choice Seafood Company et al v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Choice Seafood Company
Represented By: Edward Charles Duckers
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Leppo
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Princess, LLC
Represented By: Edward Charles Duckers
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Fishing, LLC
Represented By: Edward Charles Duckers
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Pritzker
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?