Ward v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Ward
Defendant: Stephen Wright and Lake County
Case Number: 1:2015cv05627
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2017 02:00 PM.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
September 13, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 37 Motion to Dismiss.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
February 25, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Continue; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?