Westgate Petroleum Company, Inc., d/b/a Helms Petroleum v. International Insurance Company of Hannover, SE et al

Plaintiff: Westgate Petroleum Company, Inc., d/b/a Helms Petroleum
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover, SE
Case Number: 1:2016cv00115
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 7, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON WESTGATE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 52 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 30, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/30/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 13, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS Motions terminated: 31 36 Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/13/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
July 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCLAIM TO ADD ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS PARTY by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
February 4, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westgate Petroleum Company, Inc., d/b/a Helms Petroleum v. International Insurance Company of Hannover, SE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Petroleum Company, Inc., d/b/a Helms Petroleum
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover, SE
Represented By: Robert Wayne Keaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?