Darrimon v. Smith

Plaintiff: Diane Darrimon
Defendant: Jeff Smith
Case Number: 1:2016cv00808
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING REPLY DEADLINES AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 7 MOTION to Remand . Replies due by 5/12/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 23, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrimon v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Darrimon
Represented By: Mike Ewing
Represented By: Andre Michael Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?