Bennett-Wofford v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gail Bennett-Wofford, Dana Wofford and Mark Bennett
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00891
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/1/16. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
May 9, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Confirming Appointment of Special Master. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/9/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
March 10, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/10/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett-Wofford v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Bennett-Wofford
Represented By: Michael M. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Wofford
Represented By: Michael M. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bennett
Represented By: Michael M. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Edward George Schloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?