VanCleave v. Hostess Brands, LLC

Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. VanCleave
Defendant: Hostess Brands, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv02779
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
July 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 21 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/10/2016. Replies due by 8/24/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/25/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 18, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanCleave v. Hostess Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hostess Brands, LLC
Represented By: Naoki Stephen Kaneko
Represented By: Frank C. Rothrock
Represented By: Michael Kevin Underhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. VanCleave
Represented By: Suzanne Havens-Beckman
Represented By: Preston W. Leonard
Represented By: Yitzchak Hillel Lieberman
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: David Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?