Elem Indian Colony of Pomo Indians of the Sulphur Bank Rancheria v. Ceiba Legal, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Elem Indian Colony of Pomo Indians of the Sulphur Bank Rancheria
Defendant: Ceiba Legal, LLP, Michael Hunter, Anthony Steele, David Brown, Adrian John, Paul Steward, Natalie Sedano Garcia and Kiuya Brown
Case Number: 1:2016cv03081
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/9/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 2, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 70 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 10, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/10/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 29, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup (pursuant to 68 stipulation). (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 16, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 65 STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 3, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 18, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 58 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 23, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND/OR STAY AND REFERRING CASE FOR MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT 48 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 16, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARINGS 46 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 8, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 42 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 40 REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 9, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 3, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/8/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elem Indian Colony of Pomo Indians of the Sulphur Bank Rancheria v. Ceiba Legal, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elem Indian Colony of Pomo Indians of the Sulphur Bank Rancheria
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceiba Legal, LLP
Represented By: Ian Robert Barker
Represented By: Paula Marie Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hunter
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Steele
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brown
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian John
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Sedano Garcia
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiuya Brown
Represented By: Michael Erik Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?