Hoopa Valley Indian Tribe v. Bureau of Reclamation of the Department of the Interior of the United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Hoopa Valley Indian Tribe
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation of the Department of the Interior of the United States of America and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 1:2016cv04294
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
March 31, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading and Case Management Deadlines. Case Management Conference continued to 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 24, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING 102 FEBRUARY 8, 2017 INJUNCTION. The Parties shall meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve any disputes that may arise relating to the Bureaus implementation of the surface flushing flows, deep flushing flows, and emergency dilution flows ordered herein, and/or the adaptive management process in paragraph 16, prior to seeking further intervention from this Court. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
February 22, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline and Case Management Conference Deadline. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/2/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 8, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick re: 33 Motion to Dismiss, 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 88 Motion to Strike, 89 Motion for Joinder, and 98 Motion for Leave to File. The Court enters preliminary injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
December 21, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 68 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiff may file its second amended complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
October 28, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 STIPULATION extending deadlines re 33 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 11/16/2016. Motion Hearing continued to 1/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 17, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS - Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 11/2/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 3, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 28 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2016. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/03/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoopa Valley Indian Tribe v. Bureau of Reclamation of the Department of the Interior of the United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoopa Valley Indian Tribe
Represented By: Thomas P. Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation of the Department of the Interior of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?